WI AB809 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Failed on May 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-12 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Failed on May 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-12 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 302.045 (2) (c), 302.05 (3) (a) 1., 302.113 (9g) (b) (intro.), 973.01 (3g) and 973.01 (3m); and to create 304.02 (1m) and 973.09 (3) (d) 7. of the statutes; Relating to: earned release from parole or extended supervision and discharge from probation. (FE)
Title
Earned release from parole or extended supervision and discharge from probation. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-11 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 61 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-12 | House | Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82 |
2020-05-12 | House | Placed on calendar 5-12-2020 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a) |
2020-02-28 | House | Report vetoed by the Governor on 2-28-2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Presented to the Governor on 2-25-2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 2-25-2020 |
2020-02-20 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read a second time |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-19-2020 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2020-02-11 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-11 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 61, Noes 37 |
2020-02-11 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-11 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-11 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2020-02-11 | House | Read a second time |
2020-02-06 | House | Placed on calendar 2-11-2020 by Committee on Rules |
2020-02-06 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-02-06 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 8, Noes 6 |
2020-02-06 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 9, Noes 5 |
2020-02-06 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-02-05 | House | Representative Brandtjen added as a coauthor |
2020-02-05 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Schraa and Sanfelippo |
2020-02-04 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-04 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-04 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-01-30 | House | Public hearing held |
2020-01-30 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-01-27 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2020-01-27 | House | Introduced |