WI AB816 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 115.28 (55) (title); and to create 115.28 (56), 118.40 (2r) (b) 2. L., 118.40 (2x) (b) 2. L., 118.60 (2) (a) 9., 119.23 (2) (a) 9. and 121.02 (1) (L) 8. of the statutes; Relating to: incorporating the Holocaust and other genocides into the state model social studies standards and requiring instruction on the Holocaust and other genocides. (FE)
Title
Incorporating the Holocaust and other genocides into the state model social studies standards and requiring instruction on the Holocaust and other genocides. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee on Education and rereferred to committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c) |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Representative Shankland added as a coauthor |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Education |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2020-02-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-18 | House | Representatives Kolste, C. Taylor, August, Ramthun and Neubauer added as coauthors |
2020-02-18 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 98, Noes 0 |
2020-02-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-18 | House | Read a second time |
2020-02-18 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Rules and take up |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-02-18 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2020-02-13 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-02-13 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-12 | House | Public hearing held |
2020-02-10 | House | Representative Crowley added as a coauthor |
2020-02-07 | House | Representative Zamarripa added as a coauthor |
2020-02-03 | House | Representative Loudenbeck added as a coauthor |
2020-01-31 | House | Representative Hutton added as a coauthor |
2020-01-28 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs |
2020-01-28 | House | Introduced |