WI AB817 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 969.03 (1) (intro.); and to create 969.02 (1m) and 969.03 (1g) of the statutes; Relating to: bail for a criminal defendant who is charged with bail jumping.
Title
Bail for a criminal defendant who is charged with bail jumping.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-11 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 62 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - Assembly: Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 61 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - Assembly: Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 61 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Government Oversight and Courts, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Government Oversight and Courts |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2020-02-11 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-11 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 62, Noes 36 |
2020-02-11 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-11 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-11 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2020-02-11 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 61, Noes 37 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Crowley, Bowen, Hintz, Hesselbein, Spreitzer, Doyle, B. Meyers, McGuire, Neubauer, Fields, Pope, Ohnstad, Sargent, Subeck, Sinicki, C. Taylor, Emerson, Cabrera, Goyke, Brostoff and Stuck |
2020-02-11 | House | Read a second time |
2020-02-06 | House | Placed on calendar 2-11-2020 by Committee on Rules |
2020-02-06 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-02-06 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 9, Noes 5 |
2020-02-06 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 9, Noes 5 |
2020-02-06 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-02-05 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Crowley |
2020-02-04 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Sortwell |
2020-01-30 | House | Public hearing held |
2020-01-28 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2020-01-28 | House | Introduced |