WI AB818 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Published 3-4-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Published 3-4-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 348.27 (9r); and to create 348.27 (9r) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: permits for the overweight transport of the residue material resulting from treatment of municipal sewage. (FE)
Title
Permits for the overweight transport of the residue material resulting from treatment of municipal sewage. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Stafsholt [R] | Rep. Gae Magnafici [R] | Rep. Shannon Zimmerman [R] | Sen. Jerry Petrowski [R] |
Sen. Patty Schachtner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Published 3-4-2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 3-3-2020. 2019 Wisconsin Act 146 |
2020-02-28 | House | Presented to the Governor on 2-28-2020 by directive of the Speaker |
2020-02-25 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 2-25-2020 |
2020-02-20 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read a second time |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Senate Organization and take up |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2020-02-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-18 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2020-02-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2020-02-18 | House | Read a second time |
2020-02-18 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Rules and take up |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-02-18 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2020-02-18 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2020-02-11 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-02-11 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-04 | House | Public hearing held |
2020-02-03 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Stafsholt |
2020-01-29 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-01-29 | House | Introduced |