WI AB832 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 973.01 (2) (d) 3.; to renumber and amend 302.113 (9) (ag) and 302.113 (9) (am); to amend 20.410 (1) (a), 20.410 (1) (ab), 20.410 (1) (b), 302.11 (7) (am), 302.113 (9) (b), 302.113 (9) (c), 302.114 (9) (ag), 304.072 (4), 911.01 (4) (c), 939.50 (3) (d), 950.04 (1v) (gm), 973.01 (2) (d) 4. and 973.15 (5); and to create 20.410 (1) (kj), 301.03 (6w), 973.01 (5m), 973.01 (8) (a) 6. and 973.156 of the statutes; Relating to: sentence credits for time on parole or extended supervision, sentencing limitations on extended supervision, early discharge from extended supervision, making an appropriation, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Sentence credits for time on parole or extended supervision, sentencing limitations on extended supervision, early discharge from extended supervision, making an appropriation, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-20 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-11 | House | Representative Cabrera added as a coauthor |
2020-02-05 | House | Representative Haywood added as a coauthor |
2020-01-30 | House | Read first time and referred to Joint Review Committee on Criminal Penalties |
2020-01-30 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-01-30 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab832 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB832.pdf |