WI AB834 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 8.05 (1) (j) 2m., 8.10 (2) (am), 8.15 (1m), 8.20 (8) (ae) and 120.06 (6) (b) 3m. of the statutes; Relating to: public notice of noncandidacy for incumbent local elected officials. (FE)
Title
Public notice of noncandidacy for incumbent local elected officials. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2020-02-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-18 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2020-02-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-18 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2020-02-18 | House | Read a second time |
2020-02-18 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Rules and take up |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-02-18 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2020-02-18 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2020-02-13 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-02-11 | House | Public hearing held |
2020-02-05 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Ramthun |
2020-01-31 | House | Representative Spiros added as a coauthor |
2020-01-30 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Campaigns and Elections |
2020-01-30 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab834 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB834.pdf |