WI AB840 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 104.045 (1) of the statutes; Relating to: counting of tips for tipped employees and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Counting of tips for tipped employees and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 63 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2020-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-20 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2020-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 63, Noes 36 |
2020-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Sinicki |
2020-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2020-02-18 | House | Made a special order of business at 11:06 AM on 2-20-2020 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 21 |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-02-18 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 13, Noes 1 |
2020-02-13 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-02-12 | House | Public hearing held |
2020-02-11 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-05 | House | Representative Haywood added as a coauthor |
2020-01-30 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs |
2020-01-30 | House | Introduced |