WI AB853 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 938.34 (14m); to amend 346.17 (3) (a), 346.17 (3) (b), 346.17 (3) (c), 346.17 (3) (d), 346.65 (1) (a), 346.65 (1) (b), 346.65 (3), 346.65 (4m), 346.65 (5), 943.23 (1g), 943.23 (1r), 943.23 (2) (a), 943.23 (2) (b), 943.23 (2g), 943.23 (3) (a), 943.23 (3) (b) and 943.23 (3g); and to create 938.266, 938.34 (8m), 938.34 (14m) (b), 939.6197, 967.055 (2) (c), 967.055 (2) (d), 967.056 and 973.0337 of the statutes; Relating to: theft of a vehicle; victim impact panels; increased penalties for reckless driving; increased penalties for fleeing an officer; and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Theft of a vehicle; victim impact panels; increased penalties for reckless driving; increased penalties for fleeing an officer; and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-27 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-25 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-21 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-18 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-11 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Hutton |
2020-02-06 | House | Public hearing held |
2020-02-05 | House | Representative Brandtjen added as a coauthor |
2020-02-03 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2020-02-03 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab853 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB853.pdf |