WI AB858 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-9)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-9)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create subchapter III of chapter 153 [precedes 153.85] of the statutes; Relating to: opioid and methamphetamine data system and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Opioid and methamphetamine data system and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2020-02-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-18 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2020-02-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 adopted |
2020-02-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Plumer |
2020-02-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2020-02-18 | House | Read a second time |
2020-02-18 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Rules and take up |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-02-18 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2020-02-18 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2020-02-14 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-13 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-12 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-02-12 | House | Referred to joint committee on Finance |
2020-02-12 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Substance Abuse and Prevention, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2020-02-12 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Substance Abuse and Prevention, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2020-02-12 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-02-11 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-10 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-07 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Plumer |
2020-02-06 | House | Representative Brostoff added as a coauthor |
2020-02-06 | House | Public hearing held |
2020-02-04 | House | Representative Skowronski added as a coauthor |
2020-02-03 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Substance Abuse and Prevention |
2020-02-03 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab858 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB858.pdf |