WI AB869 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 125.12 (5); to amend 125.27 (4), 125.32 (3) (c), 125.51 (5) (b) (title), 125.51 (5) (b) 4., 125.51 (5) (e), 125.68 (4) (c) 3m. and 125.68 (4) (c) 4.; and to create 125.07 (3) (a) 17., 125.12 (5) (b), 125.20, 125.26 (2v), 125.27 (5), 125.27 (6), 125.32 (3) (e), 125.32 (3m) (k), 125.51 (3) (bv), 125.51 (5) (b) 1. f., 125.51 (5) (b) 2m., 125.51 (5) (f) and 125.68 (4) (d) of the statutes; Relating to: creating a private event venue permit issued by the Department of Revenue; the issuance by the Department of Revenue of retail alcohol beverage permits for motor vehicle racetrack grounds and for the state fair park; authorizing caterers to make retail sales of alcohol beverages on racetrack grounds; closing hours for certain alcohol beverage retailers and wineries and hours for retail sales by brewers; and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Creating a private event venue permit issued by the Department of Revenue; the issuance by the Department of Revenue of retail alcohol beverage permits for motor vehicle racetrack grounds and for the state fair park; authorizing caterers to make retail sales of alcohol beverages on racetrack grounds; closing hours for certain alcohol beverage retailers and wineries and hours for retail sales by brewers; and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 84 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Trade, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2020-03-02 | Senate | LRB correction (Assembly Amendment 3) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | LRB correction (Assembly Amendment 1) |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Printed engrossed by the direction of the Senate Chief Clerk-5781 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Trade |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2020-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-20 | House | Representative Bowen added as a coauthor |
2020-02-20 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 84, Noes 13 |
2020-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 adopted |
2020-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representatives Swearingen, Kuglitsch, Loudenbeck and Vorpagel |
2020-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 withdrawn and returned to author |
2020-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Swearingen, Loudenbeck and Kuglitsch |
2020-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2020-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2020-02-18 | House | Made a special order of business at 11:13 AM on 2-20-2020 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 21 |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-02-18 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 13, Noes 1 |
2020-02-18 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2020-02-17 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-13 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-02-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Swearingen and Kuglitsch |
2020-02-12 | House | Public hearing held |
2020-02-10 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs |
2020-02-10 | House | Introduced |