WI AB873 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 71.05 (6) (a) 15., 71.10 (4) (i), 71.21 (4) (a), 71.26 (2) (a) 4., 71.30 (3) (f), 71.34 (1k) (g), 71.45 (2) (a) 10. and 71.49 (1) (f); to repeal and recreate 71.05 (6) (a) 15., 71.10 (4) (i), 71.21 (4) (a), 71.26 (2) (a) 4., 71.30 (3) (f), 71.34 (1k) (g), 71.45 (2) (a) 10. and 71.49 (1) (f); and to create 20.835 (2) (bh), 71.07 (8s), 71.28 (8s) and 71.47 (8s) of the statutes; Relating to: an income tax credit for the property taxes paid on agricultural buildings and improvements and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
An income tax credit for the property taxes paid on agricultural buildings and improvements and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 63 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 63 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions, Ayes 8, Noes 1 |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Jacque |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2020-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-20 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 99, Noes 0 |
2020-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-20 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2020-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 4 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2020-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 4 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Tranel |
2020-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 withdrawn and returned to author |
2020-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Tranel |
2020-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 63, Noes 36 |
2020-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Considine, Spreitzer, Billings, Bowen, Brostoff, Cabrera, Doyle, Emerson, Fields, Goyke, Haywood, Hebl, Hesselbein, Hintz, Kolste, McGuire, B. Meyers, Neubauer, Ohnstad, Pope, Riemer, Sargent, Shankland, Sinicki, Subeck, C. Taylor, Vining, Vruwink and Zamarripa |
2020-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 withdrawn and returned to author |
2020-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Tranel |
2020-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2020-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Considine, Spreitzer, Billings, Bowen, Brostoff, Cabrera, Doyle, Emerson, Fields, Goyke, Haywood, Hebl, Hesselbein, Hintz, Kolste, McGuire, B. Meyers, Neubauer, Ohnstad, Pope, Riemer, Sargent, Shankland, Sinicki, Subeck, C. Taylor, Vining, Vruwink and Zamarripa |
2020-02-18 | House | Made a special order of business at 11:14 AM on 2-20-2020 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 21 |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-02-18 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2020-02-18 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2020-02-17 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Joint Committee on Finance |
2020-02-17 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-02-17 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Tranel |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to joint committee on Finance |
2020-02-14 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2020-02-11 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-02-11 | House | Public hearing held |
2020-02-11 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-10 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture |
2020-02-10 | House | Introduced |