WI AB875 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 71.05 (6) (b) 19. c. and 71.05 (6) (b) 19. d.; and to create 71.05 (6) (b) 19. cm. and 71.05 (6) (b) 19. dm. of the statutes; Relating to: modifying the medical care insurance subtraction for self-employed individuals. (FE)
Title
Modifying the medical care insurance subtraction for self-employed individuals. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Representative Oldenburg added as a coauthor |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2020-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-20 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2020-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2020-02-18 | House | Made a special order of business at 11:16 AM on 2-20-2020 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 21 |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-02-18 | House | Report passage recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2020-02-18 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-17 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Joint Committee on Finance |
2020-02-17 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to joint committee on Finance |
2020-02-14 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2020-02-11 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-02-11 | House | Public hearing held |
2020-02-10 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture |
2020-02-10 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab875 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB875.pdf |