WI AB88 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-6)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-6)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 27.01 (7) (gm) 6. of the statutes; Relating to: vehicle admission receipts issued to certain members of the U.S. armed forces and to certain members of the national guard. (FE)
Title
Vehicle admission receipts issued to certain members of the U.S. armed forces and to certain members of the national guard. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-01-21 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-03-24 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-03-12 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs |
2015-03-12 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab88 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB88.pdf |