WI AB885 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal subchapter VI (title) of chapter 601 [precedes 601.93]; to amend 601.45 (1); and to create 16.5285, 20.145 (5), subchapter VII (title) of chapter 601 [precedes 601.80], 601.80, 601.83, 601.85 and subchapter VIII (title) of chapter 601 [precedes 601.93] of the statutes; Relating to: Wisconsin Healthcare Stability Plan, reinsurance of health carriers, reallocating savings from health insurer fee, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, granting rule-making authority, and making appropriations. (FE)
Title
Wisconsin Healthcare Stability Plan, reinsurance of health carriers, reallocating savings from health insurer fee, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, granting rule-making authority, and making appropriations. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Novak [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-02-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Hintz, Hesselbein, Spreitzer, Doyle, Riemer, Vruwink, Neubauer, Brostoff, Wachs, Subeck, Sinicki, Kessler, Meyers, Hebl, Ohnstad, Kolste, Considine, Berceau, Shankland, Barca and Billings |
2018-02-19 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-02-15 | House | Made a special order of business at 2:05 PM on 2-20-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 26 |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2018-02-14 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 13, Noes 3 |
2018-02-14 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 12, Noes 4 |
2018-02-13 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Joint Committee on Finance |
2018-02-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Joint Committee on Finance |
2018-02-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Joint Committee on Finance |
2018-02-13 | House | Executive action taken |
2018-02-12 | House | Public hearing held |
2018-02-08 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-02-08 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-02-05 | House | Representative Petersen added as a coauthor |
2018-02-01 | House | Withdrawn from committee on Insurance and referred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Assembly Rule 42 (3)(c) |
2018-01-30 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance |
2018-01-30 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab885 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB885.pdf |