WI AB896 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 165.87 of the statutes; Relating to: body cameras on law enforcement officers. (FE)
Title
Body cameras on law enforcement officers. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. John Spiros [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-02-19 | House | Representative C. Taylor added as a coauthor |
2020-02-18 | House | Made a special order of business at 11:20 AM on 2-20-2020 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 21 |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-02-18 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2020-02-18 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-02-13 | House | Public hearing held |
2020-02-13 | House | Representative McGuire added as a coauthor |
2020-02-11 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs |
2020-02-11 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab896 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB896.pdf |