WI AB897 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-28 - Available for scheduling
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 5.05 (2m) (a), 6.56 (4) and 7.15 (1) (g); and to create 5.05 (2m) (fg) of the statutes; Relating to: investigations by the Elections Commission based on information from the Electronic Registration Information Center and from municipal clerks indicating that Wisconsin registered voters may have voted more than once in the same election, and complaints filed with the Elections Commission alleging election law violations. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Investigations by the Elections Commission based on information from the Electronic Registration Information Center and from municipal clerks indicating that Wisconsin registered voters may have voted more than once in the same election, and complaints filed with the Elections Commission alleging election law violations. (FE)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-20 - House - Assembly: Decision of the Chair upheld (Y: 63 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-28SenateAvailable for scheduling
2020-02-28SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
2020-02-21SenateReceived from Assembly
2020-02-20HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2020-02-20HouseRead a third time and passed
2020-02-20HouseRules suspended
2020-02-20HouseOrdered to a third reading
2020-02-20HouseDecision of the Chair upheld, Ayes 63, Noes 36
2020-02-20HouseDecision of the Chair appealed
2020-02-20HousePoint of order that Assembly Amendment 2 not germane under Assembly Rule 54 (3)(f) well taken
2020-02-20HouseAssembly Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Vining, Stubbs, L. Myers, Anderson, Billings, Bowen, Brostoff, Cabrera, Considine, Crowley, Doyle, Fields, Goyke, Haywood, Hebl, Hesselbein, Hintz, Kolste, McGuire, B. Meyers, Milroy, Neubauer, Ohnstad, Pope, Riemer, Sargent, Shankland, Sinicki, Spreitzer, Stuck, Subeck, C. Taylor, Vruwink and Zamarripa
2020-02-20HouseAssembly Amendment 1 adopted
2020-02-20HouseRead a second time
2020-02-18HouseMade a special order of business at 11:21 AM on 2-20-2020 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 21
2020-02-18HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2020-02-18HouseReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 5, Noes 3
2020-02-18HouseReport Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 5, Noes 3
2020-02-18HouseExecutive action taken
2020-02-17HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Brandtjen
2020-02-13HousePublic hearing held
2020-02-12HouseRepresentative Wichgers added as a coauthor
2020-02-11HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Campaigns and Elections
2020-02-11HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback