WI AB916 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Fiscal estimate received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Fiscal estimate received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 20.285 (1) (fd); and to create 20.370 (4) (cj), 20.435 (1) (fr) and 254.07 of the statutes; Relating to: groundwater standards and waterborne dangers, funding for the state laboratory of hygiene, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Groundwater standards and waterborne dangers, funding for the state laboratory of hygiene, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-15 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-06 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-14 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
2020-02-14 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab916 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB916.pdf |