WI AB941 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Published 4-17-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Published 4-17-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 289.01 (33) of the statutes; Relating to: iron or steel slag managed as an item of value.
Title
Iron or steel slag managed as an item of value.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Tittl [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Mursau [R] | Sen. Dan Knodl [R] | Rep. Robert Kulp [R] |
Rep. Amy Loudenbeck [R] | Rep. David Murphy [R] | Rep. Ron Tusler [R] | Sen. Duey Stroebel [R] |
Sen. Robert Cowles [R] | Sen. Luther Olsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 59 N: 34 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | House | Published 4-17-2018 |
2018-04-17 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-16-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 285 |
2018-04-12 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-12-2018 |
2018-03-30 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-30-2018 |
2018-03-30 | House | LRB correction |
2018-03-21 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2018-02-22 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-22 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2018-02-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-02-22 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 laid on table, Ayes 59, Noes 34 |
2018-02-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Hebl |
2018-02-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2018-02-22 | House | Read a second time |
2018-02-20 | House | Made a special order of business at 1:25 PM on 2-22-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 27 |
2018-02-20 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2018-02-20 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Environment and Forestry, Ayes 8, Noes 4 |
2018-02-20 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Environment and Forestry, Ayes 11, Noes 1 |
2018-02-20 | House | Executive action taken |
2018-02-19 | House | Public hearing held |
2018-02-19 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Tittl |
2018-02-09 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Environment and Forestry |
2018-02-09 | House | Introduced |