WI AB948 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: analysis and assessment of Wisconsin's outdoor recreation economy. (FE)
Title
Analysis and assessment of Wisconsin's outdoor recreation economy. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-03-19 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-03-02 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-02-26 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-02-19 | House | Representative Genrich added as a coauthor |
2018-02-13 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Tourism |
2018-02-13 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab948 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB948.pdf |