WI AB97 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-5)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Representative Subeck added as a coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-5)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Representative Subeck added as a coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 940.09 (1c) (a) and 940.09 (1c) (b); and to create 940.09 (1c) (a) 2. and 940.09 (1c) (b) 2. of the statutes; Relating to: mandatory period of confinement for homicide by intoxicated use of a vehicle and providing a criminal penalty. (FE)
Title
Mandatory period of confinement for homicide by intoxicated use of a vehicle and providing a criminal penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | House | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor |
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-10-18 | House | Representative Rohrkaste added as a coauthor |
2017-04-12 | House | Withdrawn from committee on Rules and referred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Assembly Rule 24 (3)(a) |
2017-04-11 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-04-11 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 8, Noes 4 |
2017-04-06 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-04-03 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kessler |
2017-03-23 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-03-23 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-03-21 | House | Representative Tusler withdrawn as a coauthor |
2017-03-20 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-03-20 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-03-14 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-03-02 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-03-01 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-02-24 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2017-02-24 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab97 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB97.pdf |