WI AB973 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 252.14 (1) (ar) 4q.; to amend 15.08 (1m) (b), 36.25 (11) (b), 46.03 (44), 48.981 (2m) (b) 1., 60.23 (9), 69.01 (6g), 77.54 (14) (b), 77.54 (14) (d), 118.15 (3) (a), 118.25 (1) (a), 118.29 (1) (e), 146.82 (3) (a), 146.89 (1) (r) 1., 155.01 (7), 252.11 (10), 255.06 (1) (d), 255.07 (1) (d), 257.01 (5) (a) and (b), 448.03 (2) (a), 448.035 (2) to (4), 448.56 (1), 448.56 (1m) (b), 450.03 (1) (e), 450.11 (7) (b), 462.04, 895.48 (1m) (a) (intro.) and 2., 905.04 (1) (b) and (c), (2) and (3), 961.01 (19) (a), 961.23 (6) and 961.41 (3j); and to create 15.08 (1m) (bm), 15.405 (7f), 48.981 (2) (a) 1m., 69.18 (1) (cj), 77.54 (14) (f) 1m., 146.81 (1) (dc), 146.997 (1) (d) 4m., 180.1901 (1m) (h), 252.14 (1) (ar) 4s., 440.03 (13) (b) 39g., 440.08 (2) (a) 47g., 446.02 (9) (e), 450.10 (3) (a) 12., 450.11 (8) (f), chapter 466, 905.04 (1) (br), 961.397 and 990.01 (22m) of the statutes; Relating to: the regulation and licensure of naturopathic doctors, creating a naturopathic medicine examining board, granting rule-making authority, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
The regulation and licensure of naturopathic doctors, creating a naturopathic medicine examining board, granting rule-making authority, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-12 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-03-11 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-03-02 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform |
2020-03-02 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab973 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB973.pdf |