WI AB98 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 767.41 (5) (am) 15. and 16.; to amend 767.225 (1) (am), 767.41 (5) (am) (intro.), 767.41 (6) (a) and 767.451 (5m) (b); and to repeal and recreate 767.41 (5) (am) 3. to 14. of the statutes; Relating to: factors relating to the physical placement of a child.
Title
Factors relating to the physical placement of a child.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Government Oversight and Courts, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Government Oversight and Courts |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2020-01-15 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-01-15 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2020-01-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-01-15 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-01-15 | House | Read a second time |
2020-01-13 | House | Placed on calendar 1-15-2020 by Committee on Rules |
2019-11-07 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-11-07 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Family Law, Ayes 7, Noes 2 |
2019-09-10 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-06-04 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-03-22 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Family Law |
2019-03-22 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab98 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB98.pdf |