WI AJR118 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: proclaiming January 22nd as “Protect Life Day”.
Title
Proclaiming January 22nd as “Protect Life Day”.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-21 - House - Assembly: Adopted (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2020-01-21 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-01-21 | House | Representatives Tusler, Ott, Rohrkaste, Edming, Felzkowski, Nygren, Petersen, Schraa, Swearingen, Plumer, Duchow, Kurtz, Hutton, Snyder, Steineke, Petryk, Knodl, Mursau, Sortwell, Zimmerman, Wittke, Katsma, Vorpagel, Summerfield, Brooks, James, Jagler, Quinn, Kerkman, Spiros, Krug, Steffen and Oldenburg added as coauthors |
2020-01-21 | House | Adopted, Ayes 63, Noes 35 |
2020-01-17 | House | Representative Ballweg added as a coauthor |
2020-01-16 | House | Placed on calendar 1-21-2020 by Committee on Rules |
2020-01-16 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-01-16 | House | Introduced |