WI AJR119 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: proclaiming February 16 – 22, 2020, as American Birkebeiner Week in Wisconsin.
Title
Proclaiming February 16 – 22, 2020, as American Birkebeiner Week in Wisconsin.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Placed at the foot of the calendar of 2-20-2020 |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-19-2020 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2020-01-21 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-01-21 | House | Representative Quinn added as a coauthor |
2020-01-21 | House | Adopted |
2020-01-16 | House | Placed on calendar 1-21-2020 by Committee on Rules |
2020-01-16 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-01-16 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/joint_resolution/ajr119 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AJR119.pdf |