WI AJR127 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-4)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-4)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: recognizing the 29th anniversary of the start of Operation Desert Storm on January 17, 1991, and honoring the veterans of this conflict.
Title
Recognizing the 29th anniversary of the start of Operation Desert Storm on January 17, 1991, and honoring the veterans of this conflict.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2020-02-11 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-11 | House | Adopted |
2020-02-11 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2020-02-06 | House | Placed on calendar 2-11-2020 by Committee on Rules |
2020-02-04 | House | Representative Magnafici added as a coauthor |
2020-02-03 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-02-03 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/joint_resolution/ajr127 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AJR127.pdf |