WI AJR134 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-9)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-9)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: proclaiming February 2020 as Black History Month.
Title
Proclaiming February 2020 as Black History Month.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2020-02-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-18 | House | Representative Kulp added as a coauthor |
2020-02-18 | House | Adopted |
2020-02-18 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2020-02-13 | House | Senator Smith added as a cosponsor |
2020-02-13 | House | Representatives Magnafici and Spiros added as coauthors |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on calendar 2-18-2020 by Committee on Rules |
2020-02-12 | House | Senator Hansen added as a cosponsor |
2020-02-11 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-02-11 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/joint_resolution/ajr134 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AJR134.pdf |