WI AJR27 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-11)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-11)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: recognizing April 2019 as Deaf History Month in Wisconsin.
Title
Recognizing April 2019 as Deaf History Month in Wisconsin.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senator Ringhand added as a cosponsor |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2019-04-09 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-04-09 | House | Representative Kolste added as a coauthor |
2019-04-09 | House | Adopted |
2019-04-05 | House | Representatives Murphy, Hesselbein, Tusler, Neubauer, Petryk and Spiros added as coauthors |
2019-04-04 | House | Placed on calendar 4-9-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-04-04 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-04-04 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/joint_resolution/ajr27 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AJR27.pdf |