WI AJR3 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on February 14 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Report correctly enrolled on 2-14-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 14 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Report correctly enrolled on 2-14-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: proclaiming February 2019 to be American Heart Month in Wisconsin.
Title
Proclaiming February 2019 to be American Heart Month in Wisconsin.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 2-14-2019 |
2019-02-14 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Concurred in |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senator Cowles added as a cosponsor |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-13-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2019-02-12 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-02-12 | House | Adopted |
2019-02-08 | House | Senators Hansen, Johnson, Marklein, Roth and Schachtner added as cosponsors |
2019-02-08 | House | Representatives Jagler, Magnafici, Murphy, Myers, Tranel, Rodriguez and Fields added as coauthors |
2019-02-07 | House | Placed on calendar 2-12-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-02-07 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduced |