WI AJR37 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: proclaiming May 2019 as World Trade Month.
Title
Proclaiming May 2019 as World Trade Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - House - Assembly: Adopted (Y: 66 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2019-05-15 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-05-15 | House | Adopted, Ayes 66, Noes 31 |
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on calendar 5-15-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-05-07 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-05-07 | House | Introduced |