WI AJR4 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-13)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-13)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: recognizing February as Teen Dating Violence Awareness and Prevention Month.
Title
Recognizing February as Teen Dating Violence Awareness and Prevention Month.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2019-02-12 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-02-12 | House | Adopted |
2019-02-11 | House | Representative Ohnstad added as a coauthor |
2019-02-07 | House | Placed on calendar 2-12-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-02-07 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/joint_resolution/ajr4 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AJR4.pdf |