WI AJR42 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-11)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-11)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: recognizing May 6 through May 10, 2019, as Teacher Appreciation Week.
Title
Recognizing May 6 through May 10, 2019, as Teacher Appreciation Week.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2019-05-15 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-05-15 | House | Adopted |
2019-05-15 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Rules and take up |
2019-05-13 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-05-13 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/joint_resolution/ajr42 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AJR42.pdf |