WI AJR47 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-3)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-3)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: recognizing June 2019 as LGBT Pride Month.
Title
Recognizing June 2019 as LGBT Pride Month.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Senators Shilling and Hansen added as cosponsors |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2019-06-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-06-18 | House | Adopted |
2019-06-18 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Rules and take up |
2019-05-24 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-05-24 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/joint_resolution/ajr47 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AJR47.pdf |