WI AJR49 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-4)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-4)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: honoring Wisconsin native Arike Ogunbowale for an incredible college women's basketball career with the University of Notre Dame.
Title
Honoring Wisconsin native Arike Ogunbowale for an incredible college women's basketball career with the University of Notre Dame.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2019-06-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-06-18 | House | Adopted |
2019-06-17 | House | Representative Vining added as a coauthor |
2019-06-13 | House | Placed on calendar 6-18-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-05-30 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-05-30 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/joint_resolution/ajr49 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AJR49.pdf |