WI AJR52 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-14)
Status: Introduced on June 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - Available for scheduling
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relating to: congratulating the Milwaukee Bucks on their 2018-19 season.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Congratulating the Milwaukee Bucks on their 2018-19 season.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-24SenateAvailable for scheduling
2019-06-24SenateRead and referred to committee on Senate Organization
2019-06-18SenateReceived from Assembly
2019-06-18HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2019-06-18HouseRepresentative Schraa added as a coauthor
2019-06-18HouseAdopted
2019-06-13HousePlaced on calendar 6-18-2019 by Committee on Rules
2019-06-06HouseRead and referred to Committee on Rules
2019-06-06HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback