WI AJR60 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: a statement in support of 2019 H.R. 832.
Title
A statement in support of 2019 H.R. 832.
Sponsors
Rep. Tony Kurtz [R] | Rep. Don Vruwink [D] | Rep. Travis Tranel [R] | Rep. Debra Kolste [D] |
Rep. Gary Tauchen [R] | Rep. Dave Considine [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-06-18 | House | Representatives Pronschinske and Spreitzer added as coauthors |
2019-06-13 | House | Placed on calendar 6-18-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-06-12 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-06-12 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/joint_resolution/ajr60 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AJR60.pdf |