WI AJR62 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: commemorating Sun Prairie volunteer fire fighter Cory Barr, the Sun Prairie Police Department, the Sun Prairie Volunteer Fire Department, and the Sun Prairie Emergency Medical Services on the one-year anniversary of the gas line explosion in downtown Sun Prairie.
Title
Commemorating Sun Prairie volunteer fire fighter Cory Barr, the Sun Prairie Police Department, the Sun Prairie Volunteer Fire Department, and the Sun Prairie Emergency Medical Services on the one-year anniversary of the gas line explosion in downtown Sun Prairie.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Hebl [D] | Rep. Sondy Pope [D] | Rep. Jocasta Zamarripa [D] | Rep. Katrina Shankland [D] |
Rep. Staush Gruszynski [D] | Sen. Mark Miller [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-07-08 | Senate | Representative Brostoff added as a coauthor |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2019-06-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-06-20 | House | Representatives Anderson, James, Spiros, Vruwink, Sinicki, Pronschinske, Spreitzer and Ohnstad added as coauthors |
2019-06-20 | House | Adopted |
2019-06-18 | House | Placed on calendar 6-20-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-06-18 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-06-18 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/joint_resolution/ajr62 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AJR62.pdf |