WI AJR78 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-12)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-12)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: commending emergency response personnel across the state for their work during the July 2019 severe weather incidents.
Title
Commending emergency response personnel across the state for their work during the July 2019 severe weather incidents.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-10-25 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-10-25 | Senate | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2019-10-11 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2019-10-10 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-10-10 | House | Adopted |
2019-10-08 | House | Placed on calendar 10-10-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-10-08 | House | Representative Zamarripa added as a coauthor |
2019-09-03 | House | Representative Tusler added as a coauthor |
2019-08-21 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-08-21 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/joint_resolution/ajr78 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AJR78.pdf |