WI AJR83 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: recognizing and proclaiming Hispanic Heritage Month, a month-long celebration of the culture and traditions of U.S. residents who trace their roots to Spain, Mexico, Puerto Rico, and the Spanish-speaking nations of Central America, South America, and the Caribbean.
Title
Recognizing and proclaiming Hispanic Heritage Month, a month-long celebration of the culture and traditions of U.S. residents who trace their roots to Spain, Mexico, Puerto Rico, and the Spanish-speaking nations of Central America, South America, and the Caribbean.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-10-25 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-10-25 | Senate | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2019-10-11 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2019-10-10 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-10-10 | House | Adopted |
2019-10-08 | House | Placed on calendar 10-10-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-09-13 | House | Representative Skowronski added as a coauthor |
2019-09-12 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-09-12 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/joint_resolution/ajr83 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AJR83.pdf |