WI SB10 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Published 4-18-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Published 4-18-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 961.32; to renumber and amend 961.38 (1n); to amend 961.14 (4) (t) and 961.52 (2) (a) 1. and 2.; and to create 961.11 (4g) and 961.32 (2m) of the statutes; Relating to: definition of tetrahydrocannabinols and the use of cannabidiol.
Title
Definition of tetrahydrocannabinols and the use of cannabidiol.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-07 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - Assembly: Decision of the Chair upheld (Y: 64 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - Assembly: Decision of the Chair upheld (Y: 64 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Senate | Published 4-18-2017 |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-17-2017. 2017 Wisconsin Act 4 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-13-2017 |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2017-03-07 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-03-07 | House | Representative Macco added as a cosponsor |
2017-03-07 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 98, Noes 0 |
2017-03-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-03-07 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Decision of the Chair upheld, Ayes 64, Noes 34 |
2017-03-07 | House | Decision of the Chair appealed |
2017-03-07 | House | Point of order that Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 not germane under Assembly Rule 54 (3)(f) well taken |
2017-03-07 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives C. Taylor, Sinicki, Ohnstad, Stuck, Brostoff, Bowen, Goyke, Riemer, Genrich, Berceau, Wachs, Shankland, Zamarripa and Anderson |
2017-03-07 | House | Read a second time |
2017-03-07 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on calendar 3-7-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-02-27 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-02-27 | House | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Children and Families, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2017-02-23 | House | Representative Allen added as a cosponsor |
2017-02-22 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-02-15 | House | Representative Snyder added as a cosponsor |
2017-02-13 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Children and Families |
2017-02-08 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Senator Feyen added as a coauthor |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 31, Noes 1 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 19, Noes 13 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Read a second time |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator C. Larson |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Senator Vinehout added as a coauthor |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-8-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 4, Noes 0 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Representative Spreitzer added as a cosponsor |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Representative Sinicki added as a cosponsor |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Senator Olsen added as a coauthor |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Senator Marklein added as a coauthor |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Introduced |