WI SB108 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Published 3-4-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to renumber and amend 17.23 (1) (a), 17.23 (1) (b), 17.23 (1) (c) and 17.24 (2); to amend 17.23 (1) (intro.); and to create 17.23 (1) (e) and 17.24 (3) of the statutes; Relating to: vacancies in elective offices in cities and villages.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vacancies in elective offices in cities and villages.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-20 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-04SenatePublished 3-4-2020
2020-03-04SenateReport approved by the Governor on 3-3-2020. 2019 Wisconsin Act 164
2020-02-28SenatePresented to the Governor on 2-28-2020
2020-02-25SenateLRB correction (Senate Substitute Amendment 1)
2020-02-25SenateReport correctly enrolled
2020-02-21SenateReceived from Assembly concurred in
2020-02-20HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2020-02-20HouseRead a third time and concurred in, Ayes 99, Noes 0
2020-02-20HouseRules suspended
2020-02-20HouseOrdered to a third reading
2020-02-20HouseRead a second time
2020-02-18HouseMade a special order of business at 11:28 AM on 2-20-2020 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 21
2020-02-18HouseRead first time and referred to committee on Rules
2019-11-06HouseReceived from Senate
2019-11-05SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2019-11-05SenateRead a third time and passed
2019-11-05SenateRules suspended
2019-11-05SenateOrdered to a third reading
2019-11-05SenateSenate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
2019-11-05SenateSenate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
2019-11-05SenateRead a second time
2019-11-01SenatePlaced on calendar 11-5-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2019-10-28SenateSenate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Stroebel
2019-06-17SenateAvailable for scheduling
2019-06-17SenateReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Elections, Ethics and Rural Issues, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2019-06-17SenateReport adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Elections, Ethics and Rural Issues, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2019-06-12SenateExecutive action taken
2019-06-05SenateSenate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Stroebel
2019-05-07SenatePublic hearing held
2019-04-25SenateSenate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Stroebel
2019-03-15SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Elections, Ethics and Rural Issues
2019-03-15SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback