WI SB110 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 28-17)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 28-17)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 450.01 (16) (k) and 450.035 (2); and to create 450.035 (2c), 450.035 (2i) and 450.035 (4) of the statutes; Relating to: pharmacists and pharmacy students administering vaccines.
Title
Pharmacists and pharmacy students administering vaccines.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senator Wanggaard added as a coauthor |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb110 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB110.pdf |