WI SB113 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 30-8)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 30-8)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: increasing funding for the child psychiatry consultation program and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Increasing funding for the child psychiatry consultation program and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-08-29 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-08-29 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Universities, Technical Colleges, Children and Families, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2019-08-27 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Representative Fields added as a cosponsor |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities, Technical Colleges, Children and Families |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb113 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB113.pdf |