WI SB114 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-4)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-4)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 71.10 (4) (i); and to create 20.835 (2) (cd) and 71.07 (8n) of the statutes; Relating to: creating a refundable individual income tax credit for the parent of a stillbirth. (FE)
Title
Creating a refundable individual income tax credit for the parent of a stillbirth. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Senator Testin added as a coauthor |
2019-12-18 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb114 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB114.pdf |