WI SB117 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Published 3-4-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Published 3-4-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 440.99 (4), 440.997 (2), 440.997 (3) and 440.997 (5); to renumber 440.994 (2) (a); to renumber and amend 440.9945 (1); to amend 440.99 (6), 440.99 (7), 440.99 (11), 440.991 (2) (b), 440.9915 (title), 440.9915 (1) (intro.), 440.9915 (1) (a), 440.9915 (1) (b), 440.9915 (1) (c), 440.9915 (1) (e), 440.9915 (1) (f), 440.9915 (1) (h), 440.9915 (1) (i), 440.9915 (1) (j), 440.9915 (1) (k), 440.9915 (1) (L), 440.992 (1), 440.992 (2) (intro.), 440.992 (2) (e), 440.992 (2) (f), 440.992 (2) (g), 440.992 (4), 440.9925 (1), 440.9925 (2), 440.994 (1), 440.994 (2) (intro.), 440.994 (3), 440.994 (4), 440.994 (5), 440.9945 (2), 440.995 (1), 440.995 (2), 440.995 (3), 440.9955 (1) (intro.), 440.9955 (1) (b), 440.9955 (1) (c), 440.9955 (2), 440.996 (1) (intro.), 440.996 (2) (intro.), 440.996 (2) (a), 440.996 (2) (b), 440.996 (2) (g), 440.997 (1), 440.9975 and 440.998; to repeal and recreate 440.99 (2), 440.9915 (2), 440.992 (5) and 440.9985; and to create 440.99 (4r), 440.99 (5d), 440.99 (6c), 440.99 (6r), 440.99 (8c), 440.99 (9m), 440.9915 (1) (bm), 440.9915 (1) (gm), 440.9915 (1) (he), 440.9915 (1) (hm), 440.9915 (1) (hs), 440.9915 (1) (m), 440.9915 (1) (n), 440.9915 (1) (o), 440.9925 (1m), 440.994 (2) (ag), 440.994 (3m), 440.994 (6), 440.9945 (1g), 440.9945 (3), 440.9945 (4), 440.9945 (5), 440.9945 (6), 440.9945 (7), 440.9945 (8), 440.997 (2m) and 440.997 (3m) of the statutes; Relating to: adopting revisions to the state's uniform athlete agents act and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Adopting revisions to the state's uniform athlete agents act and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Andre Jacque [R] | Rep. Robert Brooks [R] | Rep. Ron Tusler [R] | Rep. Mike Kuglitsch [R] |
Rep. Timothy Ramthun [R] | Rep. Chuck Wichgers [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Published 3-4-2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 3-3-2020. 2019 Wisconsin Act 180 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 2-28-2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2020-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-20 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2020-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2020-02-18 | House | Made a special order of business at 11:29 AM on 2-20-2020 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 21 |
2020-02-18 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2019-11-06 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Read a second time |
2019-11-01 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-5-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-09-30 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-09-30 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Universities, Technical Colleges, Children and Families, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2019-09-30 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Universities, Technical Colleges, Children and Families, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-08-27 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-08-08 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Jacque |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities, Technical Colleges, Children and Families |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Introduced |