WI SB119 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-3)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-3)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: housing grants to homeless individuals and families and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Housing grants to homeless individuals and families and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-08-13 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-07-23 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Bernier |
2019-07-23 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Bernier |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Representative Ohnstad added as a cosponsor |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Representative Novak added as a cosponsor |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Utilities and Housing |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb119 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB119.pdf |