WI SB12 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 71.01 (8j), 71.05 (6) (a) 29., 71.21 (7), 71.26 (3) (e) 4., 71.34 (1k) (o) and 71.45 (2) (a) 20. of the statutes; Relating to: eliminating deductions for moving expenses for businesses that move out of the state or out of the United States. (FE)
Title
Eliminating deductions for moving expenses for businesses that move out of the state or out of the United States. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Representative Edming added as a cosponsor |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Representative Bowen added as a cosponsor |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Representative Brostoff added as a cosponsor |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Feyen |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Representative Neubauer added as a cosponsor |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb12 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB12.pdf |