WI SB122 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-3)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-3)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 16.308 (3m); and to create 16.308 (3m) (b) to (i) and 16.308 (3s) of the statutes; Relating to: grants to homeless shelters, modifying administrative rules promulgated by the Department of Administration, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Grants to homeless shelters, modifying administrative rules promulgated by the Department of Administration, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Senator Larson added as a coauthor |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Local Government, Small Business, Tourism and Workforce Development, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 3 recommended by Committee on Local Government, Small Business, Tourism and Workforce Development, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Local Government, Small Business, Tourism and Workforce Development, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Local Government, Small Business, Tourism and Workforce Development, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-09-05 | Senate | Senate Amendment 3 offered by Senator Darling |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Darling |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Darling |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Representative Novak added as a cosponsor |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government, Small Business, Tourism and Workforce Development |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb122 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB122.pdf |