WI SB123 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 29-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 29-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: skills enhancement grants and making an appropriation.
Title
Skills enhancement grants and making an appropriation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Darling |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Representative Shankland added as a cosponsor |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government, Small Business, Tourism and Workforce Development |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb123 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB123.pdf |