WI SB124 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 28-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 28-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 106.11 and 106.13 (2); and to create 106.115 and 106.120 of the statutes; Relating to: employment and training activities for homeless populations, the Council on Workforce Investment, and local workforce development boards.
Title
Employment and training activities for homeless populations, the Council on Workforce Investment, and local workforce development boards.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | LRB correction |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Representative Ohnstad added as a cosponsor |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Representative Novak added as a cosponsor |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government, Small Business, Tourism and Workforce Development |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb124 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB124.pdf |