WI SB125 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Passed on February 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-06 - Published 2-6-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Passed on February 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-06 - Published 2-6-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 23.0917 (5g) (g) of the statutes; Relating to: amounts obligated under the Warren Knowles-Gaylord Nelson Stewardship 2000 Program for water infrastructure projects in state parks and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Amounts obligated under the Warren Knowles-Gaylord Nelson Stewardship 2000 Program for water infrastructure projects in state parks and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-21 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-05 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-05 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | Senate | Published 2-6-2020 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 2-5-2020. 2019 Wisconsin Act 93 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 2-3-2020 |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2020-01-21 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-01-21 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 98, Noes 0 |
2020-01-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-01-21 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-01-21 | House | Read a second time |
2020-01-16 | House | Placed on calendar 1-21-2020 by Committee on Rules |
2020-01-16 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2019-11-06 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 33, Noes 0 |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 adopted |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Read a second time |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor |
2019-11-01 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-5-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-11-01 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2019-11-01 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2019-07-26 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Cowles |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Cowles |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Introduced |